Financial history ASPECT LIVING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1177031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £770.63k £1.04m £1.07m £1.16m £1.27m
Total expenditure £743.34k £871.49k £931.18k £1.07m £1.23m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £53.11k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £20.33k £81.55k £85.64k £59.44k £45.54k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £750.30k £954.61k £984.64k £1.09m £1.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £1.44k £4.48k £5.16k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £742.20k £305.24k £931.18k £1.07m £1.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.15k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.20k £4.62k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £566.25k £0 £0 £0