Accounts and annual returns MAIDSTONE ISLAMIC CENTER LIMITED

Charity number: 1178668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 December 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 December 2023 43 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window