Financial history IDEAS MATTER

Charity number: 1178999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £120.15k £278.36k £152.33k £122.20k £123.92k
Total expenditure £88.07k £174.82k £123.02k £113.99k £127.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A