Financial history BEAUFORT MALE CHOIR

Charity number: 511779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £44.59k £17.57k £12.85k £22.73k £34.15k
Total expenditure £48.22k £14.38k £13.86k £18.51k £32.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £400 £10.20k £10.00k £10.00k N/A