Financial history BRIXHAM THEATRE CIO

Charity Number: 1178208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £100.13k £26.17k £59.58k £92.24k £143.04k
Total expenditure £86.57k £2.03k £58.75k £89.85k £131.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.64k N/A N/A N/A