Accounts and annual returns SEDEDS

Charity number: 1179563
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 July 2024 03 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
Annual return 01 July 2023 03 October 2024 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 373 days
Annual return 01 July 2022 19 September 2024 507 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 739 days
Annual return 01 July 2021 19 September 2024 872 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1104 days
Annual return 01 July 2020 12 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1469 days