Accounts and annual returns THE LLOYD-REASON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 23 June 2024 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required