Accounts and annual returns GRAVITY HQ

Charity number: 1178068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 November 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2024 02 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2023 18 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2023 18 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2022 13 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2022 13 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2021 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2021 11 October 2022 40 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 November 2020 30 November 2021 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2020 30 November 2021 90 days late Download Open in new window