Accounts and annual returns THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF LONGRIDGE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Charity number: 511894
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 November 2016 07 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 13 November 2015 11 July 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 November 2015 Not Required
Annual return 13 November 2014 17 August 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 November 2014 Not Required
Annual return 13 November 2013 06 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 November 2013 Not Required