Trustees PRUDHOE & DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1179503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Felicity Pullen Chair 08 June 2021
None on record
Margaret Denise Durham Trustee 03 June 2024
None on record
Dr Leslie Mitchell Trustee 05 June 2023
None on record
Canon Janice Beasant Scott Dip.TP,MA Trustee 30 May 2022
None on record
Jean Thomas JP Trustee 30 May 2022
None on record
Patricia Anne Taylor Trustee 08 June 2021
None on record
JANET ANN PORTER Trustee 23 May 2016
None on record