Accounts and annual returns CAPEL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1179661
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 July 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 15 July 2024 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 July 2023 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 13 July 2023 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 June 2023 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 08 June 2023 343 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 June 2023 707 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 08 June 2023 708 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 June 2023 1066 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 June 2023 1066 days late Download Open in new window