Financial history REWRITE YOUR STORY LTD

Charity Number: 1181494
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £59.92k £71.13k £79.20k £54.88k £62.27k
Total expenditure £48.86k £82.45k £70.56k £64.33k £43.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.14k N/A N/A £23.17k