Financial history HORNSEA FIRST AID CENTRE

Charity number: 1178210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £7.61k £1.59k £3.96k £3.46k £6.36k
Total expenditure £5.53k £0 £5.34k £3.49k £3.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A