Financial history Impact Thame

Charity Number: 1179483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £33 £3.54k £51 £959 £3.63k
Total expenditure £3.35k £291 £1.24k £2.24k £5.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £158