Trustees THE BULKINGTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1178427
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNE MARY TAYLOR | Chair | 05 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stella Joy Saje | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Farmer | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Evans | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally-Ann Saunders | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Tunnicliffe | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
EILLEN MARY BOOKER | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOY MEDLOCK | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY JEAN NESBITT ACMA, CGMA | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA KEARNS | Trustee | 01 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ASKEW | Trustee | 01 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
GWYNETH ENID ROE | Trustee | 05 November 1992 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.