Accounts and annual returns THE CHILDREN OF LINCOLN ACTIVITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 512125
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 15 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 February 2020 291 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required