Accounts and annual returns PLATO TRUST
Charity number: 512171
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2009 | 14 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2009 | 17 July 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | 10 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | 29 May 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2007 | 25 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2007 | 11 May 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2006 | 21 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2006 | 22 May 2006 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window