Financial history UNITED KINGDOM PHOTOPHERESIS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1178321
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £20.00k £27.50k
Total expenditure £2.44k £3.22k £0 £18.87k £18.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A