Financial history BRAYWICK COURT SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1179006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £9.86k £110.07k £7.97k £8.22k £21.63k
Total expenditure £8.32k £28.22k £21.37k £17.64k £29.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A