Accounts and annual returns MUST BE ME

Charity number: 1179393
Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window