Accounts and annual returns ALDERLEY EDGE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 512231
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 21 December 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 13 August 2015 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required