Financial history Haddon Charity For Performing Arts

Charity number: 1181254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.86k £95.06k £76.06k £85.10k £68.00k
Total expenditure £24.37k £80.30k £57.21k £100.52k £86.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £900 £14.50k £400 £1.50k £1.50k