Accounts and annual returns THE GARDEN HOUSE (MARPLE) CHARITY

Charity Number: 1182133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 January 2025 28 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 January 2025 28 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 January 2024 29 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 January 2024 29 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 30 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 23 December 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 23 December 2022 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 16 December 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 16 December 2021 16 days late Download Open in new window