Trustees THE HAWTHORNE PRIMARY SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL FUND

Charity number: 512324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Suzanne Bointon Trustee 07 November 2024
None on record
Lucy Smith Trustee 07 September 2024
None on record
Lee Maddock Trustee 18 October 2019
None on record
Michael Pugh Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Jennifer Kirkwood Trustee 11 September 2017
None on record
Rachel Jarvis Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record