Accounts and annual returns BETHANY CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity Number: 1178517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 05 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 February 2024 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 February 2024 22 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window