Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GORNAL AND SEDGLEY
Charity number: 1179471

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CATHERINE AMY MITCHELL | Chair | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Hazel Matthews | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Cox | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Joseph Turner | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Elaine Apperley | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANINE ROSEMARY HUMPHRIES | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JEANNE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HAROLD MOSS | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOAN MARGARET DAIN | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEITH HENRY TOMLINSON | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY TAMAR BATE | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD NORMAN GRIST | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY SYBEL REED | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOAN SULLIVAN | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ANNE BAKER | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA JOYCE MOSS | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|||||
SUZANNE ELIZABETH BRADLEY | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.