Financial history WASHINGTON VILLAGE U3A

Charity number: 1179094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.70k £1.22k £10.51k £16.86k £23.14k
Total expenditure £14.89k £1.87k £10.75k £17.24k £20.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 N/A