Financial history THE WHISTLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.75k £5.02k £11.85k £11.60k £25.09k
Total expenditure £3.55k £2.62k £13.04k £10.40k £23.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A