Financial history RUGBY HOSPITAL RADIO SERVICE

Charity number: 512419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.09k £4.33k £1.95k £2.93k £1.70k
Total expenditure £5.73k £1.47k £1.46k £3.84k £1.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A