Financial history SOFT BONES UK FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1181117
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £8.40k £2.71k £1.11k £110 £1.24k
Total expenditure £7.06k £774 £3.64k £240 £1.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A