Accounts and annual returns THE ALFRED STALEY MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1183104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 05 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 11 February 2021 On Time