Financial history LUCY ELLIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179478
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.56k £750 £3.44k £404 £0
Total expenditure £50.40k £13.43k £4.87k £3.70k £633
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A