Financial history WOKINGHAM MEN'S SHED

Charity number: 1179642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.62k £2.42k £7.53k £3.78k £7.75k
Total expenditure £2.24k £1.81k £3.43k £3.76k £3.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A