Financial history LUMINARY LIMITED

Charity number: 1181835
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £208.81k £406.64k £316.95k £288.92k £542.79k
Total expenditure £91.74k £273.01k £340.62k £435.47k £453.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £8.60k £25 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £542.79k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £440.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.92k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0