Financial history SPRING UP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1182754
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.83k £14.56k £21.05k £14.07k £13.93k
Total expenditure £10.42k £12.93k £13.41k £15.21k £8.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A