Trustees CLEVEDON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1182579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robin Gerard Schaefer Chair 24 September 2022
None on record
David Raymond Hinton Trustee 29 September 2024
None on record
Robert Cannock Trustee 24 September 2023
None on record
Victoria Elizabeth Burt Trustee 24 September 2023
None on record
Karen Gomm Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Antony Wareham Trustee 20 May 2018
None on record