Financial history THE IDRIS DAVIES MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 512624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £190 £173 £152 £139 £178
Total expenditure £253 £74 £81 £796 £371
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A