Financial history LANGNEY COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1179763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £47.20k £21.39k £2.80k £2.10k £7.92k
Total expenditure £14.83k £23.57k £22.08k £4.96k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.00k £14.86k N/A N/A N/A