Financial history SANDBROOK COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 512745
Charity reporting is overdue by 1654 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010
Total gross income £14.65k £29.69k £15.86k £15.78k £12.33k
Total expenditure £14.22k £12.54k £17.10k £14.72k £11.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A