Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SANDERSTEAD ST MARYS
Charity number: 1179723

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev GRANT GEOFFREY COHEN | Chair | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Edward Jackson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kim Lorraine Browne | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Forshaw | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Rowland | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clive Christensen | Trustee | 13 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Browne | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Mary Macan | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Amanda Storey | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aleen Solly | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE CHRISTOPHER CHRISTENSEN | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHAEL EMMA WOODS | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.