Financial history THE THREE TUMOURS

Charity number: 1179681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.53k £13.68k £8.45k £5.57k £4.89k
Total expenditure £3.65k £7.18k £1.81k £870 £1.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A