Accounts and annual returns JOHN PAUL II POLISH SATURDAY SCHOOL IN LIVERPOOL

Charity number: 1183518
Charity reporting is up to date (72 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 September 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 10 September 2024 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 13 July 2023 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 13 July 2023 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window