Accounts and annual returns FAWLEY WATERSIDE MENSSHED

Charity number: 1180419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 07 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 07 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 20 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 20 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 05 February 2023 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 05 February 2023 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 29 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 25 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window