Financial history URMSTON AND DISTRICT LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 512975
Charity reporting is overdue by 480 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/03/2018 08/03/2019 08/03/2020 08/03/2021 08/03/2022
Total gross income £4.70k £4.71k £2.79k £1.16k £0
Total expenditure £1.42k £1.15k £2.00k £1.15k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A