Accounts and annual returns THE FRANKIE FOUNDATION FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 1180488
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 18 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2019 20 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 20 May 2020 On Time