Governing document CROSSROADS CARE ATTENDANT SCHEME (NUNEATON & BEDWORTH AND NORTH WARWICKSHIRE BRANCH)
Charity Number: 513042
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED 14 JUNE 1983 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 1988, 12 AUGUST 1997 AND 21 JULY 1998.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS AND PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME BY OFFERING A RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY BASED CARE ATTENDANTS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE BOROUGHS OF NUNEATON AND BEDWORTH AND NORTH WARWICKSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.