Trustees RIDGEWAY SCHOOL PTA
Charity number: 1181455

Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Ann Casey | Chair | 22 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mandeep Browning | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Hale | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Walsh | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hopkins | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Ellen Braithwaite | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Loveridge | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Winne | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Suzi Pegg | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Molly O'Riordan | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.