Accounts and annual returns SOUTH TYNESIDE ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 513115
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 29 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 11 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 13 July 2017 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2015 25 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required