Financial history COMMUNITY LITTLE HULTON

Charity number: 1183894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.15k £83.45k £138.11k £226.62k £298.34k
Total expenditure £2.83k £51.41k £84.79k £180.25k £246.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £14.59k £22.78k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A