Financial history OXFORD JAPANESE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1184474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £30.27k £33.51k £33.15k £41.42k £48.02k
Total expenditure £21.04k £31.47k £33.14k £42.20k £48.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A